NJ S2950 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires sending district to allow student to transfer to recovery high school alternative education program, provided placement is considered clinically appropriate by alcohol and drug counselor.
Title
Requires sending district to allow student to transfer to recovery high school alternative education program, provided placement is considered clinically appropriate by alcohol and drug counselor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-2) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4645 (Same As) 2017-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee