NJ S2949 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by A10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases gross income tax rate from 8.97 percent to 10.75 percent on income between $1,000,000 and $5,000,000, and provides up to $500 tax rebate to eligible taxpayers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases gross income tax rate from 8.97 percent to 10.75 percent on income between $1,000,000 and $5,000,000, and provides up to $500 tax rebate to eligible taxpayers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24SenateSubstituted by A10
2020-09-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A10 (Same As) 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.94.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback