NJ S2927 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1661
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A4396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A4396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes timelines for review and approval by Commissioner of Education of annual certified audits submitted by approved private schools for students with disabilities.
Title
Establishes timelines for review and approval by Commissioner of Education of annual certified audits submitted by approved private schools for students with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A4396 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2927 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A4396
A4396 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4396 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session