NJ S2913 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5865

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits State agency to completely or partially terminate contract concerning marine terminal or attendant real property to serve important public purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits State agency to completely or partially terminate contract concerning marine terminal or attendant real property to serve important public purpose.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4654 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
2020-09-24AssemblySubstituted for A4654
2020-09-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-09-24SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-09-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-09-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4654 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2913
A5865 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback