NJ S2867 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2373
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipal land banking in conjunction with online property database development.
Title
Permits municipal land banking in conjunction with online property database development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4248 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-22-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4248 (1R) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-16) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2867 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A4248 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S2867
A4248 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S2867