NJ S2863 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A3911
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A3911
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that motor vehicle registration expires on registrant's numerical calendar day of birth.
Title
Provides that motor vehicle registration expires on registrant's numerical calendar day of birth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted by A3911 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3911 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.217.