NJ S2851 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1647
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boards of education and school bus contractors to designate individuals as certain school bus safety personnel.*
Title
Requires boards of education and school bus contractors to designate individuals as certain school bus safety personnel.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4343 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4343 (2R) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Lagana) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2851 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A4343 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2851 (4R)
A4343 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2851 (4R)