NJ S2847 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Senate Amendment (28-0) (Sweeney)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires spaying or neutering of cats and dogs prior to sale or other release from animal rescue organization facility, kennel, pet shop, shelter, or pound.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires spaying or neutering of cats and dogs prior to sale or other release from animal rescue organization facility, kennel, pet shop, shelter, or pound.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateSenate Amendment (28-0) (Sweeney)
2017-03-13SenateSenate Amendment (25-0) (Sweeney)
2017-02-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-12-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback