NJ S2829 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1660
Note: Carry Foward to future A3945
Note: Carry Foward to future A3945
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Male Teachers of Color Mentorship Pilot Program;" appropriates $50,000.
Title
Establishes "Male Teachers of Color Mentorship Pilot Program;" appropriates $50,000.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2829 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2829 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4595 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2829 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4595 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading