NJ S2813 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1036
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4547 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4547 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes temporary rate adjustment for certain nursing facilities; appropriates $62.3 million.
Title
Authorizes temporary rate adjustment for certain nursing facilities; appropriates $62.3 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4547 (1R) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2813 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4547 (1R)
A4547 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.90.
A4547 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.90.