NJ S2813 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1493
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits landlords from requiring residential tenants to pay rent and other related charges through electronic funds transfer, requires landlords to provide receipts for cash payments.*
Title
Prohibits landlords from requiring residential tenants to pay rent and other related charges through electronic funds transfer, requires landlords to provide receipts for cash payments.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-1) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Stack) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2813 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A4396 (Same As) 2016-12-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A4396 (Same As) 2016-12-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee