NJ S2812 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3863
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A1414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A1414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes licensure for associate marriage and family therapists.
Title
Establishes licensure for associate marriage and family therapists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A1414 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1414 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
A3863 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3863 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading