NJ S2812 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-22 - Substituted by A4156 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes task force to study issues related to sexual assault on college campuses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes task force to study issues related to sexual assault on college campuses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-22SenateSubstituted by A4156 (1R)
2015-10-19SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2015-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4156 (Same As) 2015-12-02 - Approved P.L.2015, c.165.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback