NJ S2804 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to conduct certain analysis and comparison study of electric transmission grid operating in New Jersey.
Title
Requires BPU to conduct certain analysis and comparison study of electric transmission grid operating in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |