NJ S2794 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A4261 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A4261 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for collection of sales tax from certain remote sellers.
Title
Provides for collection of sales tax from certain remote sellers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | Substituted by A4261 (1R) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Sweeney) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A4261 (Same As) 2018-08-27 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.