NJ S2792 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4178
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $500,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues and "2009 Farmland Preservation Fund" to State Agriculture Development Committee for municipal planning incentive grants for farmland preservation purposes.
Title
Appropriates $500,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues and "2009 Farmland Preservation Fund" to State Agriculture Development Committee for municipal planning incentive grants for farmland preservation purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3697 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S4178 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S4178 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading