NJ S2787 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2120
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4481 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4481 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Task Force on Long-Term Care Quality and Safety.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Task Force on Long-Term Care Quality and Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4481 (1R) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2787 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4481 (1R)
A4481 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.88.
A4481 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - Approved P.L.2020, c.88.