NJ S2763 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain persons from prohibition on posting certain information regarding law enforcement officers on Internet.
Title
Exempts certain persons from prohibition on posting certain information regarding law enforcement officers on Internet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4314 (Same As) 2016-11-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee