NJ S2748 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1697
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts fuel used for operation of certain school buses from petroleum products gross receipts tax and motor fuel tax; clarifies tax treatment of certain dyed fuel thereunder; clarifies determination of taxable estates of certain decedents.*
Title
Exempts fuel used for operation of certain school buses from petroleum products gross receipts tax and motor fuel tax; clarifies tax treatment of certain dyed fuel thereunder; clarifies determination of taxable estates of certain decedents.*
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-1) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (35-0) (Sarlo) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2748 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4281 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4281 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading