NJ S2736 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S73

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides gross income tax credit to certain totally and permanently disabled veterans for rent constituting property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides gross income tax credit to certain totally and permanently disabled veterans for rent constituting property taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-10-19SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-07-28SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1090 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S73 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback