NJ S2734 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A4066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A4066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2023.
Title
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Substituted by A4066 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4066 (Same As) 2022-08-12 - Approved P.L.2022, c.99.