NJ S2721 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Recommitted to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Recommitted to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies definition of reasonably necessary deviation when legally transporting firearm or weapon in motor vehicle.
Title
Clarifies definition of reasonably necessary deviation when legally transporting firearm or weapon in motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. Michael Doherty [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4278 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2721 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2721_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2721_R1.HTM |