NJ S2676 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-13 - Substituted by A1041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts Holocaust reparations payments from legal process, and from estate recovery under Medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts Holocaust reparations payments from legal process, and from estate recovery under Medicaid program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-13SenateSubstituted by A1041
2015-06-08SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-05-07SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2015-05-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-12-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1041 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.124.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback