NJ S2670 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A4189 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A4189 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends duration of first five designated UEZs for two additional years; specifies permissible use of UEZ funds; requires DCA Commissioner to assess and issue report on UEZ program.
Title
Extends duration of first five designated UEZs for two additional years; specifies permissible use of UEZ funds; requires DCA Commissioner to assess and issue report on UEZ program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A4189 (3R) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4189 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly