NJ S2639 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3945
Note: Carry Over of previous A5628
Note: Carry Over of previous A5628
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "New Jersey Online Foreclosure Sale Act;" permits online foreclosure sales for real property.
Title
The "New Jersey Online Foreclosure Sale Act;" permits online foreclosure sales for real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2024-10-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3945 (Carry Over) 2023-06-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5628 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3791 (Same As) 2025-01-30 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A5628 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3791 (Same As) 2025-01-30 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)