NJ S2636 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5220
Note: Carry Over of previous S4034
Note: Carry Over of previous S4034
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boards of education to adopt suicide prevention policies and DOE to establish model suicide prevention policy.
Title
Requires boards of education to adopt suicide prevention policies and DOE to establish model suicide prevention policy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3241 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5220 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S4034 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5220 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S4034 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2636 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2636_I1.HTM |