NJ S2636 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A3731 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A3731 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "County Code Pilot Program" for certain counties.*
Title
Establishes "County Code Pilot Program" for certain counties.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Senate | Substituted by A3731 (ACS) |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3731 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.157.