NJ S2624 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2897
Note: Carry Foward to future S2987
Note: Carry Over of previous S1637
Note: Carry Foward to future S2987
Note: Carry Over of previous S1637
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides dedicated funding for promotion of apprenticeships and apprenticeship programs from Workforce Development Partnership Fund.
Title
Provides dedicated funding for promotion of apprenticeships and apprenticeship programs from Workforce Development Partnership Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2624 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2624 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3597 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1637 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2624 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3597 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1637 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee