NJ S2602 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Farm Worker Epidemic Health and Safety Act"; concerns public health and certain protections for farm workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Farm Worker Epidemic Health and Safety Act"; concerns public health and certain protections for farm workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-22AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2020-07-30SenatePassed by the Senate (37-1)
2020-07-22SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4404 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback