NJ S2590 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S498
Note: Carry Foward to future A4053
Note: Carry Foward to future A4053
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires civil service examination for police and correctional police officers to include questions to identify implicit racial bias.
Title
Requires civil service examination for police and correctional police officers to include questions to identify implicit racial bias.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2590 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S2590 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A5541 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S2590 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A5541 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee