NJ S2585 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A3201 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A3201 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes Howell House in Cape May as Harriet Tubman Museum in New Jersey.
Title
Recognizes Howell House in Cape May as Harriet Tubman Museum in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A3201 (ACS) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4044 (Same As) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3201 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Approved P.L.2020, c.91.
A3201 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Approved P.L.2020, c.91.