NJ S2575 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3984
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reallocates casino investment alternative tax to Atlantic City to pay debt service on municipal bonds issued.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reallocates casino investment alternative tax to Atlantic City to pay debt service on municipal bonds issued.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-25SenateSubstituted by A3984
2014-12-08SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3984 (Same As) 2016-01-17 - Cond. Veto, Passed Both House, No Action Taken By Governor

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback