NJ S2574 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes supplemental State aid to school districts in municipality with significant decrease in commercial property valuation; makes appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes supplemental State aid to school districts in municipality with significant decrease in commercial property valuation; makes appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-25SenateSubstituted by A3983
2014-12-08SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3983 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.143.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback