NJ S2545 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2062
Note: Carry Over of previous A5354
Note: Carry Over of previous S3389
Note: Carry Over of previous A5354
Note: Carry Over of previous S3389
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires adoption of and training on anti-discrimination and anti-harassment policy by certain campaign committees; creates Office on Discrimination and Harassment Prevention; appropriates $2,000,000.
Title
Requires adoption of and training on anti-discrimination and anti-harassment policy by certain campaign committees; creates Office on Discrimination and Harassment Prevention; appropriates $2,000,000.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2545 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1248 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5354 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3389 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1248 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5354 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3389 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2545 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2545_I1.HTM |