NJ S2544 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Substituted by A3427 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Substituted by A3427 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for temporary professional or occupational licensure for qualified nonresident military spouses.
Title
Provides for temporary professional or occupational licensure for qualified nonresident military spouses.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] |
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | Senate | Substituted by A3427 (2R) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3427 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.264.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2544 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2544_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2544_R1.HTM |