NJ S2535 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3468

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A1897/4269 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for certain criminal and civil justice reforms, particularly with respect to legal consequences associated with certain marijuana and hashish offences as well as broadening awareness of available expungement relief.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for certain criminal and civil justice reforms, particularly with respect to legal consequences associated with certain marijuana and hashish offences as well as broadening awareness of available expungement relief.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-16SenateSubstituted by A1897/4269 (ACS/2R)
2020-11-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-11-09SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-11-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1897 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A3468 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback