NJ S253 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4177
Note: Carry Over of previous A6013
Note: Carry Over of previous A6013
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public water systems to develop lead service line inventories and replace lead service lines.
Title
Requires public water systems to develop lead service line inventories and replace lead service lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4177 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1262 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A6013 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A1262 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A6013 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee