NJ S2507 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - Substituted by A4055 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-22 - Substituted by A4055 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Ireland Trade Commission in Department of State.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Ireland Trade Commission in Department of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Substituted by A4055 (1R) |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4055 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - Approved P.L.2023, c.64.