NJ S2507 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A3321 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A3321 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends "Administrative Procedure Act" to require State agencies to use various electronic technologies in rule-making procedures.
Title
Amends "Administrative Procedure Act" to require State agencies to use various electronic technologies in rule-making procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A3321 (1R) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3321 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.259.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2507 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2507_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2507_R1.HTM |