NJ S2506 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4205 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4205 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enters New Jersey into Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact.
Title
Enters New Jersey into Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted by A4205 (1R) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4205 (Same As) 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.229.