NJ S2505 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Oct 7 @ 1:00 pm in Committee Room 4, 1st Floor, State House Annex, Trenton, NJ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Oct 7 @ 1:00 pm in Committee Room 4, 1st Floor, State House Annex, Trenton, NJ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Education to establish and maintain an educator common application and web portal.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Education to establish and maintain an educator common application and web portal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4025 (Carry Over) 2023-06-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3864 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3864 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee