NJ S2493 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5832
Note: Carry Over of previous S4193
Note: Carry Over of previous S4193
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum base NJ FamilyCare per diem reimbursement rate of $1,100 for special care nursing facility with neurologically impaired young adult unit.
Title
Establishes minimum base NJ FamilyCare per diem reimbursement rate of $1,100 for special care nursing facility with neurologically impaired young adult unit.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2075 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A5832 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S4193 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Senate (36-0)
A5832 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S4193 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Senate (36-0)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2493 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2493_I1.HTM |