NJ S2439 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A1286 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A1286 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of federal impact aid reserve account.
Title
Authorizes the establishment of federal impact aid reserve account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Substituted by A1286 (1R) |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1286 (Same As) 2015-05-07 - Approved P.L.2015, c.46.