NJ S243 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3125
Note: Carry Over of previous S3731
Note: Carry Over of previous A3827
Note: Carry Over of previous S3731
Note: Carry Over of previous A3827
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces threshold for filing annual disclosure statement with ELEC from $50,000 in public contracts to $17,500.
Title
Reduces threshold for filing annual disclosure statement with ELEC from $50,000 in public contracts to $17,500.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S243 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3731 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2828 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3827 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3731 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2828 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3827 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S243 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/243_I1.HTM |