NJ S2425 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises law relating to common interest communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises law relating to common interest communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3851 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenatePocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
2020-01-13SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-2)
2020-01-06SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (67-3-7)
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted for A3851 (2R)
2019-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-12-05AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-06-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
2019-06-10SenatePassed by the Senate (34-2)
2019-06-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3851 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2425 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback