NJ S2413 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriations totaling $9,563,415 to DOH for grants of $7,765,325 to Newark Beth Israel Hospital and $1,798,090 to St. Francis Medical Center to implement improved health outcomes and sustainable transformation of healthcare delivery.
Title
Makes supplemental appropriations totaling $9,563,415 to DOH for grants of $7,765,325 to Newark Beth Israel Hospital and $1,798,090 to St. Francis Medical Center to implement improved health outcomes and sustainable transformation of healthcare delivery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4003 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (44-31-1) |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A4003 |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4003 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S2413