NJ S239 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A2299 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A2299 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires municipalities to exempt 100% disabled veterans from construction permit surcharge fees for improvements to promote living unit accessibility.*
Title
Requires municipalities to exempt 100% disabled veterans from construction permit surcharge fees for improvements to promote living unit accessibility.*
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A2299 (1R) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Van Drew) |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2299 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.273.