NJ S237 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2978
Note: Carry Over of previous A4658
Note: Carry Over of previous A4658
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Clean Energy Act of 2024"; establishes 100 percent clean electricity standard and directs BPU to establish clean electricity certificate program.
Title
"New Jersey Clean Energy Act of 2024"; establishes 100 percent clean electricity standard and directs BPU to establish clean electricity certificate program.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2978 (Carry Over) 2022-08-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4658 (Carry Over) 2022-09-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A1480 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A4658 (Carry Over) 2022-09-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A1480 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee