NJ S2345 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A322

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands scope of New Jersey Regulatory Flexibility Act dealing with economic impact of rules on small businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands scope of New Jersey Regulatory Flexibility Act dealing with economic impact of rules on small businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3578 (Same As) 2018-10-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A322 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - INT 1RA REF ARO

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback