NJ S2341 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-20 - Substituted by A3415 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-20 - Substituted by A3415 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, after study, DEP to adopt total maximum daily loads for Barnegat Bay ecosystem, and requires DEP to adopt nutrient standards for NJ marine waters.*
Title
Requires, after study, DEP to adopt total maximum daily loads for Barnegat Bay ecosystem, and requires DEP to adopt nutrient standards for NJ marine waters.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-20 | Substituted by A3415 (1R) | |
2010-12-13 | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Smith) | |
2010-12-06 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-15 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-11-15 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-10-07 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3415 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.